OH HB211 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Local Government Public Safety and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 1547.30, 4585.31, 4585.32, 4585.33, and 4585.34; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 4585.31 (1547.306), 4585.32 (1547.307), 4585.33 (1547.308), and 4585.34 (1547.309); and to enact sections 1547.305 and 1547.58 of the Revised Code to alter the process by which a person may obtain title to a watercraft vessel or outboard motor that has been left on the person's property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Obtain title to watercraft or outboard motor left on property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2019-06-24SenateIntroduced
2019-06-20HousePassed
2019-06-05HouseReported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-04-30HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-04-18HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15New CodeSee Bill Text
1547New CodeSee Bill Text
154730Amended CodeCitation Text
1547305New CodeSee Bill Text
154758New CodeSee Bill Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4585Amended CodeCitation Text
458531Amended CodeCitation Text
458532Amended CodeCitation Text
458533Amended CodeCitation Text
458534Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback