OH HB214 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 3701.79 and to enact sections 2919.10 and 2919.101 of the Revised Code to prohibit a person from performing, inducing, or attempting to perform or induce an abortion on a pregnant woman who is seeking the abortion because an unborn child has or may have Down Syndrome.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit abortion if unborn has or may have Down Syndrome

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23 Effective 3/23/18
2017-12-13SenatePassed
2017-12-13SenateReported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-11-15SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-11-02SenateIntroduced
2017-11-01HousePassed
2017-10-26HouseReported: Health
2017-05-16HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2017-05-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29New CodeSee Bill Text
2919New CodeSee Bill Text
291910New CodeSee Bill Text
2919101New CodeSee Bill Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3701Amended CodeCitation Text
370179Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback