OH HB225 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 58-20)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18 - Appropriations effective June 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 58-20)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18 - Appropriations effective June 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1509.071, 1509.13, 1509.151, and 1509.34 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 343.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly to modify the law governing idle and orphaned oil and gas wells and to make additional appropriations.
Title
Regards plugging idle or orphaned wells
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Effective 9/28/18 - Appropriations effective June 29, 2018 | |
2018-06-07 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Energy and Natural Resources |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-17 | House | Passed |
2018-01-17 | House | Reported - Substitute: Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-05-23 | House | Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
15 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
15 | 09 | 071 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 09 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 09 | 151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 09 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |