OH HB239 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-01 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-01 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.0712, 3301.0729, 3313.61, 3313.612, and 3313.6114 of the Revised Code to remove the requirement that students take a nationally standardized assessment for graduation, to revise the law on end-of-course examinations, to prohibit student retention under the Third Grade Reading Guarantee for the 2020-2021 school year, and to require each school district to form a work group to evaluate the amount of time students spend on testing.
Title
Reduce end-of-course assessments; require testing work groups
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-05-28 | House | Passed - Amended |
2020-05-28 | House | Reported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education |
2019-05-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 01 | 0712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 01 | 0729 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 6114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 612 | Amended Code | Citation Text |