OH HB255 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 107.03, 5703.48, and 5703.95 of the Revised Code to require the Tax Commissioner's biennial tax expenditure report to include information on property tax exemptions and to require the Tax Expenditure Review Committee to periodically review each property tax exemption.
Title
Review and inform about tax exemptions
Sponsors
Rep. James Hoops [R] | Rep. John Becker [R] | Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R] | Rep. Doug Green [R] |
Sen. Catherine Ingram [D] | Rep. Kyle Koehler [R] | Rep. Craig Riedel [R] | Rep. John Rogers [D] |
Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 48 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 48 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2020-11-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-11-18 | House | Passed |
2020-09-24 | House | Informally passed |
2020-09-22 | House | Informally passed |
2020-06-11 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2019-05-28 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 07 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 03 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 03 | 95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |