OH HB265 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Re-referred: Aging and Long-Term Care
Pending: House Aging and Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Re-referred: Aging and Long-Term Care
Pending: House Aging and Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 173.07, 173.071, 173.072, and 173.073 of the Revised Code to create a dementia care certificate.
Title
Create dementia care certificate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-06 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | House | Re-referred: Aging and Long-Term Care |
2019-11-06 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2019-06-04 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2019-05-28 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Aging
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Long-Term Care
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Health and Human Services : Aging
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Long-Term Care
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 73 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 73 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 73 | 071 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 73 | 072 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 73 | 073 | New Code | See Bill Text |