OH HB282 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-11)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-01 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-01 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 109.32, 109.572, 2915.01, 2915.08, 2915.081, 2915.082, 2915.09, 2915.091, 2915.093, 2915.094, 2915.095, 2915.10, 2915.101, 2915.12, and 2915.13 and to enact sections 2915.14 and 2915.15 of the Revised Code to allow charitable organizations to conduct electronic instant bingo and to make other changes to the law governing bingo.
Title
Permit use of electronic instant bingo devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-05-28 | House | Passed |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2019-06-18 | House | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2019-06-11 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 09 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 572 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 15 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 081 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 082 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 093 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 094 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 15 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |