OH HB354 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - Effective 8/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - Effective 8/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 1901.186 of the Revised Code to provide the Tiffin-Fostoria municipal court with concurrent jurisdiction with the Seneca County court of common pleas in operating a drug addiction recovery program.
Title
Grant two courts concurrent authority to operate drug recovery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-01 | Effective 8/1/18 | |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported: Judiciary |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | House | Passed |
2017-11-29 | House | Reported: Criminal Justice |
2017-10-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2017-09-20 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
19 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 01 | 186 | New Code | See Bill Text |