OH HB38 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 22 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-22 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 22 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-22 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 135.77, 135.774, 307.04, 1115.05, 1321.52, 1321.68, 1322.01, 1322.02, 1322.04, 1322.07, 1322.09, 1322.10, 1322.12, 1322.15, 1322.29, 1322.30, 1322.32, 1322.34, 1322.43, 1322.50, 1322.52, 1345.01, 1349.72, 2913.11, and 4712.05; to enact section 1319.17; and to repeal sections 1322.24, 1322.25, and 1349.16 of the Revised Code relating to commercial credit reports, the Business Linked Deposit Program, the General Loan Law, the Ohio Banking Law, the Consumer Installment Loan Act, the Residential Mortgage Loan Law, utility supply contract duration, and COVID-19-related property tax valuation complaints.
Title
Provide credit report to businesses/allow businesses to dispute
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | Senate | Passed |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Informally passed |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed |
2019-11-26 | House | Reported - Substitute: Financial Institutions |
2019-02-13 | House | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced |