OH HB442 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-20)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21 - Certain provisions effective April 4, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-20)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21 - Certain provisions effective April 4, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 127.16, 1561.07, 2925.01, 3307.01, 3307.24, 3309.01, 3309.011, 3313.68, 3313.7110, 3313.7113, 3313.721, 3319.22, 3319.222, 3319.223, 3319.227, 3701.33, 3717.27, 3717.47, 3718.011, 3718.03, 3728.04, 4104.32, 4104.34, 4104.36, 4104.37, 4117.103, 4169.02, 4169.03, 4169.04, 4169.05, 4169.06, 4701.06, 4701.17, 4713.01, 4713.14, 4713.17, 4713.42, 4713.56, 4730.11, 4731.04, 4731.15, 4731.16, 4731.171, 4731.19, 4731.22, 4731.293, 4731.298, 4731.36, 4731.572, 4734.211, 4734.31, 4736.01, 4736.02, 4736.03, 4736.05, 4736.06, 4736.08, 4736.09, 4736.10, 4736.11, 4736.12, 4736.14, 4736.15, 4745.04, 5107.541, and 6111.30; to enact new section 3319.221 and sections 1533.722, 4169.11, and 4762.011; and to repeal sections 3319.221, 3319.225, 3319.2210, 3745.14, 4104.33, 4104.35, and 4734.281 of the Revised Code to revise the state's occupational regulations.
Title
Modify certified public accountant qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Effective 4/12/21 - Certain provisions effective April 4, 2023 | |
2020-12-22 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-06-09 | House | Passed |
2020-06-04 | House | Reported - Substitute: Commerce and Labor |
2019-12-11 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2019-12-09 | House | Introduced |