OH HB444 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-8)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-8)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3.061, 3.30, 9.65, 165.01, 165.03, 503.07, 505.43, 505.86, 505.87, 505.871, 517.27, 715.82, 742.33, 742.34, 1545.05, 1710.02, 1907.15, 2151.70, 2152.42, 3721.15, 4503.03, 4765.43, 5153.13, and 5705.25 of the Revised Code to make various changes to township law, to make changes to the laws governing ambulance staffing, and to abate certain unpaid property taxes, penalties, and interest due on property that had been owned by a state college or university, but is currently owned by a township.
Title
Revise the township law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Effective 4/12/21 | |
2020-12-22 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Passed |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2020-11-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-11-19 | House | Passed |
2020-11-12 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2020-01-28 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2019-12-12 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Economic Development
Employment
Housing and Real Property
State and Local Government : Local Government
Taxation
Transportation : Highways, Roads, and Bridges
Employment
Housing and Real Property
State and Local Government : Local Government
Taxation
Transportation : Highways, Roads, and Bridges