OH HB45 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective 6/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective 6/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.259 of the Revised Code to designate May as "Neurofibromatosis Awareness Month."
Title
Designate an awareness month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Effective 6/1/18 | |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported: Health |
2017-02-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced |