OH HB46 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-15)
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Refer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review
Pending: Senate General Government and Agency Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 113.60, 113.61, 113.62, 113.63, 113.64, 113.65, 113.66, 113.67, 113.68, and 113.69 of the Revised Code to require the Treasurer of State to establish the Ohio State Government Expenditure Database.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish the Ohio State Government Expenditure Database

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-09SenateRefer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review
2019-10-07SenateIntroduced
2019-10-02HousePassed
2019-05-16HouseReported - Amended: State and Local Government
2019-02-13HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
113New CodeSee Bill Text
11360New CodeSee Bill Text
11361New CodeSee Bill Text
11362New CodeSee Bill Text
11363New CodeSee Bill Text
11364New CodeSee Bill Text
11365New CodeSee Bill Text
11366New CodeSee Bill Text
11367New CodeSee Bill Text
11368New CodeSee Bill Text
11369New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback