OH HB47 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5715.19 of the Revised Code to increase the time within which property tax complaints must be decided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise time decide property tax complaint;rename Legal Assistance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-05-21SenateIntroduced
2019-05-15HousePassed
2019-05-01HouseReported - Amended: Ways and Means
2019-02-13HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
120Amended CodeCitation Text
12052Amended CodeCitation Text
120521Amended CodeCitation Text
12053Amended CodeCitation Text
19Amended CodeCitation Text
1901Amended CodeCitation Text
190126Amended CodeCitation Text
1907Amended CodeCitation Text
190724Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2303Amended CodeCitation Text
2303201Amended CodeCitation Text
39Amended CodeCitation Text
3953Amended CodeCitation Text
3953231Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4705Amended CodeCitation Text
470510Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5715Amended CodeCitation Text
571519Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback