OH HB5 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-15)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5747.01 and to enact sections 120.61, 120.62, 120.63, 120.64, 120.65, 120.66, 120.67, and 120.68 of the Revised Code to establish the Ohio Public Defender State Loan Repayment Program and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish Ohio Public Defender State Loan Repayment Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2019-06-24SenateIntroduced
2019-06-20HousePassed
2019-06-19HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2019-06-18HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-06-18HouseRe-referred - Amended: Rules and Reference
2019-05-22HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
120New CodeSee Bill Text
12061New CodeSee Bill Text
12062New CodeSee Bill Text
12063New CodeSee Bill Text
12064New CodeSee Bill Text
12065New CodeSee Bill Text
12066New CodeSee Bill Text
12067New CodeSee Bill Text
12068New CodeSee Bill Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574701Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback