OH HB50 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 505.85 and 505.87 and to enact section 505.871 of the Revised Code to allow townships to remove junk motor vehicles from public and private property and to borrow money to pay for that removal of junk motor vehicles and for other debris from private property.
Title
Townships-remove junk motor vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Clyde Evans [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-05 | Effective Date | |
2007-12-04 | Governor Action | |
2007-12-10 | End of 10-day Period | |
2007-11-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2007-11-14 | Concurrence | |
2007-11-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2007-10-09 | Committee Report | |
2007-05-10 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2007-05-10 | Introduced to Senate | |
2007-05-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-04-03 | Committee Report | |
2007-02-20 | To Local and Municipal Government & Urban Revitalization | |
2007-02-20 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_50 |