OH HB50 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4503.19 and 4561.15 of the Revised Code to require a motor vehicle certificate of registration to have a supplemental portion that contains all the information contained in the main portion of the certificate except for the address of the person to whom the certificate is issued and to modify the prohibition against a pilot carrying passengers unless the pilot has a specified certification.
Title
To require a motor vehicle certificate of registration to have a supplemental portion that contains all the information contained in the main portion of the certificate except for the address of the person to whom the certificate is issued and to modify the prohibition against a pilot carrying passengers unless the pilot has a specified certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-08 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-08 | Governor' Action | |
2010-06-12 | End of 10-day period | |
2010-06-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Concurrence | |
2010-05-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-05-21 | To Highways & Transportation | |
2009-05-21 | Introduced to Senate | |
2009-05-20 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-05-06 | Committee Report | |
2009-02-24 | To Insurance | |
2009-02-24 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 03 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 61 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 61 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |