OH HB50 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 349.04, 709.023, and 718.01 of the Revised Code to exempt from municipal income tax the compensation paid to persons performing personal services for a political subdivision on its property when that property is annexed to a municipal corporation under the expedited type-II annexation proceeding unless the compensation is taxable because of the person's residency, and to permit a board of county commissioners to determine the times for and manner of holding elections for citizen members of the board of trustees of a new community organization.
Title
To exempt from municipal income tax the compensation paid to persons performing personal services for a political subdivision on its property when that property is annexed to a municipal corporation under the expedited type-II annexation proceeding unless the compensation is taxable because of the person's residency, and to permit a board of county commissioners to determine the times for and manner of holding elections for citizen members of the board of trustees of a new community organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-31 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-13 | Concurrence | |
2012-12-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-05-22 | To Ways & Means & Economic Development | |
2012-05-22 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-05-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-03-21 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-01-26 | To Local Government | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 49 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
7 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
7 | 09 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 09 | 023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
7 | 18 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |