OH HB50 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Effective 10/29/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 339.062 of the Revised Code to require that all rights to and interests in charter county hospital employee discoveries, inventions, or patents are the property of the charter county hospital.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declare certain hospital employee inventions property of hospital

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-29 Effective 10/29/19
2019-07-17SenatePassed
2019-05-08SenateReported: Government Oversight and Reform
2019-03-27SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced
2019-03-20HousePassed
2019-03-13HouseReported - Amended: Civil Justice
2019-02-13HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3New CodeSee Bill Text
339New CodeSee Bill Text
339062New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback