OH HB541 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 319.38 of the Revised Code regarding valuation adjustments for destroyed or injured property.
Title
Regards valuation adjustments for destroyed or injured property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-11-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-11-18 | House | Passed |
2020-09-24 | House | Informally passed |
2020-09-22 | House | Informally passed |
2020-06-11 | House | Reported - Amended: Ways and Means |
2020-05-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 19 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |