OH HB558 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2151.421 and 2151.423 and to enact section 2151.4210 of the Revised Code to require public children services agencies to report child abuse or neglect in military families to the appropriate military authorities.
Title
Child abuse in military families-report to military authorities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-02 | House | Passed |
2020-11-12 | House | Reported: Criminal Justice |
2020-05-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2020-03-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 51 | 421 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 4210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 51 | 423 | Amended Code | Citation Text |