OH HB59 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Effective 10/17/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.2514 of the Revised Code to designate the month of April as "Ohio Native Plant Month."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate April as Ohio Native Plant Month

Sponsors

Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Thomas Brinkman [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]
Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]
Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17 Effective 10/17/19
2019-06-27SenatePassed
2019-06-27SenateReported: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-05-01SenateRefer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced
2019-03-28HousePassed
2019-03-21HouseReported: State and Local Government
2019-02-13HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback