OH HB614 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 52-13)
Status: Passed on October 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-01 - Effective 10/1/20 - Emergency: Effective 10/1/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 52-13)
Status: Passed on October 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-01 - Effective 10/1/20 - Emergency: Effective 10/1/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4141.13 and 4141.28 and to enact sections 3333.93 and 4141.12 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 11 of H.B. 197 of the 133rd General Assembly and Sections 27, 207.26, 223.10, and 223.15 of H.B. 481 of the 133rd General Assembly to create the Unemployment Compensation Modernization and Improvement Council, to revise the claims process and duties related to that process, to require the Auditor of State to examine and make recommendations on the efficiency of the process, to require the Director of Job and Family Services to create a strategic staffing plan for employees who handle inquiries and claims for unemployment benefits, to require the Chancellor of Higher Education to create a template for workforce-education partnership programs, to provide for the distribution of some federal coronavirus relief funding to local subdivisions, to extend the renewal deadline for concealed handgun licenses for ninety days or until June 30, 2021, whichever is later, to allow licensees to apply for or renew licenses with any county sheriff until that date, to authorize the conveyance of certain state-owned land, to provide funding for community projects, to make approprations, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Study and reform unemployment compensation system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Effective 10/1/20 - Emergency: Effective 10/1/2020 | |
2020-09-23 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-06-11 | House | Passed |
2020-06-11 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Firearms
Employment : Unemployment
Finance and Appropriations
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Administrative Procedure
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : State Government
Employment : Unemployment
Finance and Appropriations
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Administrative Procedure
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 33 | 93 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 41 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 41 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 41 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |