OH HB624 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the reporting and release of certain COVID-19 testing and related information.
Title
Report and release certain COVID-19 test information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed |
2020-06-09 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2020-05-19 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2020-05-11 | House | Introduced |