OH HB63 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 65-1)
Status: Passed on February 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 65-1)
Status: Passed on February 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 2919.121 of the Revised Code to revise the procedures governing a hearing by which a court may permit a pregnant minor to consent to an abortion or by which a court may give judicial consent for a pregnant minor to have an abortion and to require a court to make its findings with respect to such a hearing by clear and convincing evidence.
Title
To revise the procedures governing a hearing by which a court may permit a pregnant minor to consent to an abortion or by which a court may give judicial consent for a pregnant minor to have an abortion and to require a court to make its findings with respect to such a hearing by clear and convincing evidence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-21 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 39 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 26 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-09-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 35 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 39 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 26 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | Effective Date | |
2011-11-04 | Governor' Action | |
2011-11-07 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-10-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-10-21 | Concurrence | |
2011-09-27 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-06-23 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-03-16 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2011-03-16 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Report | |
2011-02-01 | To Health & Aging | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 19 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |