OH HB63 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 60-25)
Status: Passed on October 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-17 - Effective 10/17/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 60-25)
Status: Passed on October 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-17 - Effective 10/17/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2903.11, 2929.01, 2929.13, and 2929.14 and to enact section 2941.1425 of the Revised Code to require an additional prison term of 6 years for felonious assault if the offender also is convicted of a specification that charges that the offender used an accelerant in committing the offense and that the harm caused by the violation resulted in a permanent, serious disfigurement or permanent, substantial incapacity and to name the act's provisions "Judy's Law."
Title
Add prison term if disfigure or incapacitate victim
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-17 | Effective 10/17/17 | |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reported: Judiciary |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2017-02-21 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 41 | 1425 | New Code | See Bill Text |