OH HB665 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 901.06, 901.71, 901.74, 1711.01, 1711.02, 1711.03, 1711.05, 1711.07, 1711.08, 1711.09, 1711.11, 1711.13, 1711.22, 1711.26, 1711.33, 1711.50, 1711.51, 1711.52, 1711.53, 1711.532, 1711.533, 1711.534, 1711.54, 1711.55, 1711.551, 1711.552, 1711.56, 1711.57, 1711.99, 3749.01, 3769.082, 3769.0811, and 5709.10; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 901.06 (1711.06), 1711.50 (993.01), 1711.51 (993.02), 1711.52 (993.03), 1711.53 (993.04), 1711.531 (993.05), 1711.532 (993.041), 1711.533 (993.042), 1711.534 (993.043), 1711.54 (993.06), 1711.55 (993.07), 1711.551 (993.08), 1711.552 (993.071), 1711.56 (993.09), and 1711.57 (993.10); to enact sections 993.99, 1711.071, 1711.091, 3769.086, and 6119.092; and to repeal sections 755.35, 755.36, 755.37, 901.07, and 1711.06 of the Revised Code to modify the laws governing agricultural societies, to recodify the law governing amusement ride safety, and to address funding and other issues related to county and independent agricultural societies and the Ohio Expositions Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Address agricultural societies and amusement ride safety

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 62 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateRefer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2020-06-17SenateIntroduced
2020-06-11HousePassed - Amended
2020-06-11HouseInformally passed
2020-06-11HouseReported - Substitute: Agriculture and Rural Development
2020-05-27HouseRefer to Committee: Agriculture and Rural Development
2020-05-19HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171101Amended CodeCitation Text
171102Amended CodeCitation Text
171103Amended CodeCitation Text
171105Amended CodeCitation Text
171106Repealed CodeCitation Text
171107Amended CodeCitation Text
1711071New CodeSee Bill Text
171108Amended CodeCitation Text
171109Amended CodeCitation Text
1711091New CodeSee Bill Text
171111Amended CodeCitation Text
171113Amended CodeCitation Text
171122Amended CodeCitation Text
171126Amended CodeCitation Text
171133Amended CodeCitation Text
171150Amended CodeCitation Text
171151Amended CodeCitation Text
171152Amended CodeCitation Text
171153Amended CodeCitation Text
1711531Amended CodeCitation Text
1711532Amended CodeCitation Text
1711533Amended CodeCitation Text
1711534Amended CodeCitation Text
171154Amended CodeCitation Text
171155Amended CodeCitation Text
1711551Amended CodeCitation Text
1711552Amended CodeCitation Text
171156Amended CodeCitation Text
171157Amended CodeCitation Text
171199Amended CodeCitation Text
374901Amended CodeCitation Text
37690811Amended CodeCitation Text
3769082Amended CodeCitation Text
3769086New CodeSee Bill Text
570910Amended CodeCitation Text
6119092New CodeSee Bill Text
75535Repealed CodeCitation Text
75536Repealed CodeCitation Text
75537Repealed CodeCitation Text
90106Amended CodeCitation Text
90107Repealed CodeCitation Text
90171Amended CodeCitation Text
90174Amended CodeCitation Text
99399New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback