OH HB67 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-14)
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4743.05 and to enact sections 4741.50, 4741.51, 4741.52, 4741.53, 4741.54, 4741.55, 4741.56, and 4741.57 of the Revised Code to create the Veterinarian Student Debt Assistance Program.
Title
Grant vet education credits for free spay and neuter services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-07-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed |
2020-06-01 | House | Reported - Substitute: Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 41 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 41 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 41 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 41 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 41 | 54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 41 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 41 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 41 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 43 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |