OH HB680 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3503.16, 3509.03, 3509.04, 3509.08, 3511.02, and 3511.04 and to enact section 3501.40 of the Revised Code to modify certain deadlines for absent voting and to direct the Secretary of State's use of federal CARES Act funds.
Title
G.A. consent-alternative election process during health emergency
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Abrams [R] | Rep. Stephen Hambley [R] | Rep. Thomas Patton [R] | Rep. William Seitz [R] |
Rep. Scott Wiggam [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed |
2020-06-04 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2020-05-27 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2020-05-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 01 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 03 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 09 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 09 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 09 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 11 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 11 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |