OH HB7 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 131.44 and 6121.04 and to enact sections 126.601, 126.61, 126.62, 126.63, 126.64, 126.65, 126.66, 126.67, and 126.68 of the Revised Code to create the H2Ohio Trust Fund for the protection and preservation of Ohio's water quality, to create the H2Ohio Advisory Council to establish priorities for use of the Fund for water quality programs, and to authorize the Ohio Water Development Authority to invest the money in the Fund and to make recommendations to the Treasurer of State regarding the issuance of securities to pay for costs related to the purposes of the Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create water quality protection and preservation programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateIntroduced
2019-06-20HousePassed - Amended
2019-06-19HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2019-05-14HouseRefer to Committee: Finance
2019-05-13HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
126New CodeSee Bill Text
126601New CodeSee Bill Text
12661New CodeSee Bill Text
12662New CodeSee Bill Text
12663New CodeSee Bill Text
12664New CodeSee Bill Text
12665New CodeSee Bill Text
12666New CodeSee Bill Text
12667New CodeSee Bill Text
12668New CodeSee Bill Text
131Amended CodeCitation Text
13144Amended CodeCitation Text
61Amended CodeCitation Text
6121Amended CodeCitation Text
612104Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback