OH HB770 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Reported - Substitute: Aging and Long-Term Care
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Reported - Substitute: Aging and Long-Term Care
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit essential caregivers to enter long-term care facilities to provide support to a facility resident in compassionate care situations during the COVID-19 state of emergency, to establish criteria for those visits, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Permit essential caregivers to enter facilities during COVID-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | House | Reported - Substitute: Aging and Long-Term Care |
2020-12-01 | House | Re-referred: Aging and Long-Term Care |
2020-11-19 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2020-11-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2020-09-30 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Long-Term Care
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Long-Term Care
Health and Human Services : Public Health