OH HB8 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-20)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-20)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 149.43 and to enact section 149.436 of the Revised Code to exempt from the Public Records Law certain information concerning a minor that is included in a record related to a traffic accident involving a school vehicle in which the minor was an occupant at the time of the accident, to allow the parent or guardian of the minor to request a record of the accident containing the exempted information, and to exempt certain protected health information from the Public Records Law.
Title
Prohibit disclosing injuries to minors in school vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Effective 9/28/18 | |
2018-06-07 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Recommitted: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported - Amended: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-02-08 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 49 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 49 | 436 | New Code | See Bill Text |