OH HB8 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2151.353, 5103.031, 5103.032, 5103.033, 5103.035, 5103.038, 5103.0313, 5103.0314, 5103.0316, 5103.0317, and 5103.31 and to repeal sections 5103.039 and 5103.0311 of the Revised Code regarding foster caregiver training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards foster caregiver training

Sponsors

Rep. Susan Manchester [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Randi Clites [D]
Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]
Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Nino Vitale [R]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-06-10SenateIntroduced
2019-06-06HousePassed
2019-06-05HouseReported - Amended: Health
2019-05-14HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-05-13HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2151Amended CodeCitation Text
2151353Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5103Amended CodeCitation Text
5103031Amended CodeCitation Text
51030311Repealed CodeCitation Text
51030313Amended CodeCitation Text
51030314Amended CodeCitation Text
51030316Amended CodeCitation Text
51030317Amended CodeCitation Text
5103032Amended CodeCitation Text
5103033Amended CodeCitation Text
5103035Amended CodeCitation Text
5103038Amended CodeCitation Text
5103039Repealed CodeCitation Text
510331Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback