OH HCR6 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To encourage General Motors to keep its Lordstown Complex open by allocating a new vehicle for production there. .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encourage General Motors to keep Lordstown complex open.

Sponsors

Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. John Becker [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Randi Clites [D]
Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]
Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Ron Hood [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]
Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]
Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]
Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]
Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Nino Vitale [R]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]

Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-03-07SenateOffered
2019-03-06HouseAdopted
2019-03-06HouseMotion to reconsider
2019-03-06HouseAdopted
2019-03-06HouseReported: Commerce and Labor
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced and Referred to Committee: Commerce and Labor

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback