OH SB10 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-11)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Effective 1/7/21 - Emergency: Act effective January 7 2021; certain provisions effective April 7, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-11)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Effective 1/7/21 - Emergency: Act effective January 7 2021; certain provisions effective April 7, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 319.16, 2307.382, 2921.41, 2953.32, 2953.321, 2953.36, 2953.51, 2953.54, and 5747.12 and to enact section 117.116 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 22 of H.B. 197 of the 133rd General Assembly to expand the penalties for theft in office based on the amount stolen, to include as restitution audit costs of the entity that suffered the loss, to modify various aspects of the laws regarding criminal and delinquency record sealing and expungement, to expand the list of debts toward satisfaction of which the Tax Commissioner may apply a tax refund due to a taxpayer, to expand the basis of a court's exercise of personal jurisdiction, to specify a separate standard for the issuing of warrants upon presentation of a court order, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Expand penalty for theft in office/restitution for audit costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-07 | Effective 1/7/21 - Emergency: Act effective January 7 2021; certain provisions effective April 7, 2021 | |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Conference report agreed to |
2020-12-17 | House | Report agreed to as emergency measure: Conference Committee on S.B. 10 |
2020-09-21 | House | Conference managers: Reps. - Lang, Seitz, Leland: Conference Committee on S.B. 10 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Conference managers: Sens. - Coley, Wilson, Craig |
2020-09-16 | House | Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Refused to concur in House amendments |
2020-06-09 | House | Passed - Amended |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2019-10-29 | House | Re-referred: Criminal Justice |
2019-10-29 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported: Criminal Justice |
2019-03-19 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 17 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 07 | 382 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 21 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 19 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |