OH SB123 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-12)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Effective 3/24/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-12)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Effective 3/24/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.078 of the Revised Code to designate the Dunkleosteus terrelli as the official state fossil fish.
Title
Designate Dunkleosteus terrelli as state fossil fish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Effective 3/24/21 | |
2020-11-18 | House | Passed |
2020-09-24 | House | Informally passed |
2020-09-22 | House | Informally passed |
2019-06-27 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2019-05-08 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2019-05-06 | House | Introduced |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Introduced |