OH SB126 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5122.04 and 5164.15 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 265.10 and 265.210 of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly to authorize mental health professionals to provide crisis assessments, without parental consent, to minors who may be suicidal or pose a risk of physical harm to others; to modify certain references to mental health professionals to reflect previous enactments; and to make an appropriation to support the employment of licensed independent social workers at educational service centers.
Title
Authorize crisis assessments of suicidal minors without consent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2020-06-02 | House | Introduced |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
Finance and Appropriations
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Finance and Appropriations
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 22 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 64 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |