OH SB144 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-19)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective 6/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-19)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective 6/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 742.05, 3304.22, 4141.04, and 4765.04, to enact new sections 3304.12, 3304.13, and 3304.14, and to repeal sections 3303.41, 3304.12, 3304.13, 3304.14, and 3304.25 of the Revised Code to abolish the Opportunities for Ohioans with Disabilities Commission, Consumer Advisory Committee, and Governor's Council on People with Disabilities; to establish a state rehabilitation services council known as the Opportunities for Ohioans with Disabilities Council; and to restore staggered terms of office for the employee members representing firefighters on the board of trustees of the Ohio Police and Fire Pension Fund.
Title
Establish Opportunities for Ohioans with Disabilities Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Effective 6/1/18 | |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed |
2017-12-07 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2017-10-10 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2017-10-02 | House | Introduced |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Passed |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Employment : Workforce Development
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Retirement
State and Local Government : State Government
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Retirement
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 03 | Repealed Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 03 | 41 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 04 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 04 | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 04 | 14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 04 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 04 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
41 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 41 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 65 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
7 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
7 | 42 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |