OH SB155 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2317.56 and to enact sections 2919.124, 2919.125, 2919.126, and 2919.127 of the Revised Code regarding pretreatment notice about the possibility of reversing a mifepristone abortion.
Title
Regards pretreatment notice of mifepristone abortion reversal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2019-11-12 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 17 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
29 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 19 | 124 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 19 | 125 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 19 | 126 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 19 | 127 | New Code | See Bill Text |