OH SB172 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Effective 6/30/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Effective 6/30/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To make operating appropriations for the Bureau of Workers' Compensation for the period beginning July 1, 2019, and ending July 31, 2019.
Title
Enacts a one-month Workers' Compensation interim budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Effective 6/30/19 | |
2019-06-30 | House | Passed |
2019-06-30 | House | Introduced |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Introduced |