OH SB184 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2950.04, 2950.041, 2950.05, 2950.06, and 2950.99 of the Revised Code to clarify the sex offender registration requirements and penalties.
Title
Clarifies requirements for sex offender registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2015-12-14 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 50 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 50 | 041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 50 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 50 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 50 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |