OH SB192 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Engrossed on November 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Ohio History Connection to designate Poindexter Village as a state historic site.
Title
Designate Poindexter Village a state historic site
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2019-11-12 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Reported: General Government and Agency Review |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Introduced |