OH SB195 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3717.22 of the Revised Code to revise the exemption from retail food establishment licensure that applies to certain wineries.
Title
Revise winery exemption from food establishment licensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture : Food Regulation
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Agriculture : Food Regulation
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 17 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |