OH SB208 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 149.43, 2919.13, 3701.79, 3701.99, and 4731.22 and to enact sections 3701.792 and 4731.92 of the Revised Code to require reports to be made after a child is born alive following an abortion or attempted abortion and to establish certain civil or criminal penalties for failing to preserve the health or life of such a child.
Title
Regards child born alive after attempted abortion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-11-12 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Health Care
State and Local Government : Public Records
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Health Care
State and Local Government : Public Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 49 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 19 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 01 | 79 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 01 | 792 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 01 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | 92 | New Code | See Bill Text |