OH SB22 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3501.22 of the Revised Code to reduce the minimum number of precinct election officials in a multi-precinct polling location in which electronic pollbooks are used.
Title
Reduce minimum number of precinct election officials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
35 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 01 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |