OH SB23 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 63-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective 7/11/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 63-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective 7/11/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2317.56, 2919.171, 2919.19, 2919.191, 2919.192, 2919.193, and 4731.22; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 2919.191 (2919.192), 2919.192 (2919.194), and 2919.193 (2919.198); and to enact new sections 2919.191 and 2919.193 and sections 2919.195, 2919.196, 2919.197, 2919.199, 2919.1910, 2919.1912, 2919.1913, and 5103.11 of the Revised Code to enact the Human Rights and Heartbeat Protection Act.
Title
Prohibit abortion if detectable heartbeat
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Effective 7/11/19 | |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2019-03-19 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 17 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 19 | 171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 192 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 193 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |