OH SB256 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2151.35, 2907.02, 2909.24, 2929.02, 2929.03, 2929.06, 2929.14, 2929.19, 2967.13, 2971.03, and 5149.101 and to enact sections 2929.07 and 2967.132 of the Revised Code regarding a bar against a sentence of life without parole, and special parole dates, for offenders who committed the offense when under age 18 and regarding dispositional hearings for abused, neglected, and dependent children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards sentencing offenders under 18 when committed offense

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 75 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-18SenateConcurred in House amendments
2020-12-17HousePassed
2020-12-17HouseReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2020-11-17HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2020-09-30HouseIntroduced
2020-09-23SenatePassed
2020-09-16SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2020-01-22SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-12-23SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
215135Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2907Amended CodeCitation Text
290702Amended CodeCitation Text
2909Amended CodeCitation Text
290924Amended CodeCitation Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292902Amended CodeCitation Text
292903Amended CodeCitation Text
292906Amended CodeCitation Text
292907New CodeSee Bill Text
292914Amended CodeCitation Text
292919Amended CodeCitation Text
2967Amended CodeCitation Text
296713Amended CodeCitation Text
2967132New CodeSee Bill Text
2971Amended CodeCitation Text
297103Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5149Amended CodeCitation Text
5149101Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback