OH SB260 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 109.572, 2919.123, 2953.25, 4729.291, 4731.22, and 4731.223 and to enact section 2919.124 of the Revised Code regarding abortion-inducing drugs.
Title
Regards abortion-inducing drugs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 54 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | House | Passed |
2020-12-16 | House | Reported: Health |
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 09 | 572 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 124 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 53 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | 223 | Amended Code | Citation Text |