OH SB289 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 349.01, 5311.05, 5311.08, 5311.081, 5311.091, 5311.16, 5311.18, 5312.02, 5312.03, 5312.06, 5312.07, and 5312.11 and to enact sections 5311.192 and 5312.16 of the Revised Code regarding condominiums and planned community properties and to make changes to the New Community Law.
Title
Regards condominiums and planned community properties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported - Amended: General Government and Agency Review |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Refer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 49 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 11 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 11 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 11 | 081 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 11 | 091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 11 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 11 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 11 | 192 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 12 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 12 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 12 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 12 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 12 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 12 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |