OH SB310 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-29 - Effective 12/29/20 - Emergency: effective 12/29/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-29 - Effective 12/29/20 - Emergency: effective 12/29/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3743.75, 5501.91, and 5739.09; to enact sections 197.01, 197.03, 197.04, 197.05, 197.06, 197.07, 197.08, 197.11, 197.12, 197.13, 5101.88, 5101.881, 5101.884, 5101.885, 5101.886, 5101.887, 5101.889, 5101.8811, and 5103.0329; and to repeal section 3317.60 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 27 as subsequently amended, 221.13, and 223.15 as subsequently amended of H.B. 481 of the 133rd General Assembly to provide for the essential operations of state government, to make capital appropriations for the biennium ending June 30, 2022, to modify capital reappropriations, to make other appropriations, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Provide federal COVID funding to local subdivisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-29 | Effective 12/29/20 - Emergency: effective 12/29/2020 | |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Conference report agreed to |
2020-12-17 | House | Conference report agreed to: Conference Committee on S.B. 310 |
2020-12-02 | House | Conference managers: Reps. - Oelslager, Scherer, Cera: Conference Committee on S.B. 310 |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Conference managers: Sens. - Dolan, Burke, Sykes |
2020-09-16 | House | Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Refused to concur in House amendments |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed - Amended |
2020-06-04 | House | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2020-05-11 | House | Introduced |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Passed |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Finance |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Finance and Appropriations
Health and Human Services : Public Health
State and Local Government : Local Government
Health and Human Services : Public Health
State and Local Government : Local Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 97 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 17 | 60 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
37 | 43 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 01 | 88 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 01 | 881 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 01 | 8811 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 01 | 884 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 01 | 885 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 01 | 886 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 01 | 887 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 01 | 889 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 03 | 0329 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 01 | 91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |